Home » Bank Exam Tips to crack Exam » Multiplication Tricks to Multiply with 11| Speed Maths Tips

Multiplication Tricks to Multiply with 11| Speed Maths Tips

Multiplication Tricks for Bank Exams.

The ability of doing speed math’s and mental calculations saves lot of time in competitive exams or entrance exams. The candidates who are preparing for any competitive exam has to learn some calculation tricks to save time and improve one’s time management skills.

Here we are providing some collection of math’s tricks to speed up your calculation ability on regular basis.




Speed Maths Tricks to Multiply with 11.

Level 1: Simple Calculations: 

Let us start first with simple calculations to understand the logic and then go for advanced calculations with bigger numbers.

Speed Maths Tricks for bank exams

I. Multiplication of two digit numbers with 11.

I.  53 × 11 = 5 8 (5 + 3 = 8)

Explanation: Here split the number into 5 and 3 and write on both ends.  Then write 8 in between 5 and 3.

II. 45 × 11 = 4 9

Explanation: Here split the number into 4 and 5 and write on both ends.  Then write 9 in between 4 and 5.

III. 72 × 11 = 7 9

IV. 51 × 11 = 5 6

V. 27 × 11 = 2 9

Practice more to have a good grip on these calculations and can able to use wherever required while solving the aptitude section in exams.

Level 2  problems:

I. 29 × 11 = 2 11  9 = 3 1 9.   (2 + 9 =11 we can’t write 11 in between 2 and 9 so write 1 in tenth place carry forward 1 and add with 2.)

II. 49 × 11 = 4 13 9 = 509.         (4 + 9 = 13, write 3 in ten’s place and 1 carry further and add with 4 it becomes 5).

III. 75 × 11= 7 12  5 = 825.

IV. 87 × 11 = 8 15 7 = 957.

V. 96 × 11 = 9 15 6  = 1056.

II. Multiplication of 4 digit numbers with 11.

Level 3  problems: 

Let us see the multiplication bigger numbers with 11.

I. 1234 × 11 = 13574.

Explanation: Write both ends of the digits as it is.

  • Unit’s place = 4.
  • Ten’s place = 7. (4+3=7). (Add 1st two digits).
  • Hundred’s place = 5 (Add 2nd two digits i.e. 3+2).
  • Thousand’s place = 3 (Add 3rd digit with a 4th digit).
  • Last place = 1.

II. 2345 × 11 =5795.

    (Write both end numbers as it is. In between those two numbers write the number by adding adjust numbers from right to left). 5+4=9, 4+3 =7, 3+2 =5.

III. 61241 × 11 =673651.

IV. 232324 × 11 =255564

Level 4  problems:

For bigger numbers the addition of two numbers gives 2 number digit. In such cases write unit digit and carry forward for further number addition.

I. 43456 × 11 =4
78016.

1’s place = 6.
10’s place = 6+5 = 11. (Write 1 at 10’s place and carry 1).
100’s place = 5 + 4 = 9. (Add 9 with carry number 1 it becomes 10 then write 0 here carry 1 forward).
1000’s place = 4+3 =7. (Add 7 with carry number 1 it becomes 8).
10, 000’s place = 3+4 = 7.
Last =4 as it is.

II. 54327 × 11 = 697597.

III. 72192 × 11 = 794112.

IV. 54786 × 11 = 602646.

V. 86545 × 11 = 951995.

At last, I would like to suggest the job seekers that in every competitive exam there is a time constraint. In the given time duration we have finished the exam. I will update these type of calculation tricks on other topics of math’s on a daily basis. Keep visiting a the site bankexamtips.in for more tips and tricks to crack bank exams.

First, analyze the logic behind these calculations and understand clearly. Do some practice then you can able to use these calculations in quantitative aptitude problems wherever required in the exam. We can just do these the calculations even on mentally.




Check Also

How to Crack English Section in Bank Exams?

How to Crack English Section in Bank Exams? -SBI clerks 2018

Preparation Tips to Crack English Section How to Crack English Section in Bank Exams?  Almost …

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

15 − thirteen =