# Multiply Big Numbers Ending With 5 in Less than 5 Seconds | Multiplication Tricks

Learning multiplication tricks helps us to solve mathematics (Quantitative Aptitude, Data Interpretation, Simplifications) in less time and can save time in competitive exams with effective time management.

Let us see the Multiplication Tricks with examples

#### 1) Multiply 2 numbers ending with **5** and its difference should be 10. Then use this easy trick to get quick answers.

**Examples:**

**25 × 35****45 × 55****65 × 75****85 × 95****95 × 105**

**In all the above examples,** numbers end with 5 and their difference is 10. Solve now.

#### 2) Multiply 2 same numbers ending with **5**. Then use this easy trick to get quick answers.

**Examples:**

**35 × 35****75 × 75****85 × 85****45 × 45****65 × 65**- 95
**× 95.**

**In all the above examples,** The two same numbers ending with 5. Solve using the shortcut trick.

#### 3) When the addition of unit digits is 10 and their first digits should be same. Then use this easy trick to get quick answers.

**Examples:**

**23× 37****34× 36****83 ×87****76× 74****234 × 236**

**In all the above examples,** The first digits are same and the addition of unit digits is 10.