Breaking News
Home » Bank Exam Tips to crack Exam » Multiplication Tricks for Bank Exams – Maths Shortcut Tricks

# Multiplication Tricks for Bank Exams:

### I. Multiplication of two digit numbers which are having the same number in 10’s place and 5 in its units place.

1) 25 × 25 = (2× 3)25 = 625.

Understand the logic behind this so that you can able to solve for big numbers.

First, we have to write 25 at the right end as shown above. Then multiply 2 with next biggest number i.e. 3 that is equal to 6. Write this 6 at left end. The answer is 625.

2) 45 × 45 = (4×5)25 = 2025.

3) 55 × 55 = (5 × 6)25 = 3025.

3)  85 × 85 = (8 × 9)25= 7225.

4) 95 × 95 = (9 ×10) 25= 9025.

### II. Multiplication of 2 digit numbers whose difference is 10 and have 5 at units place.

1)25×35 = (2 × 4)75 = 875.

Explanation: Here we have to write 75 at the right end. Then multiply 2 with 4 and write the result at left end as shown above.

2) 35 × 45 = (3×5)75 = 1575.

3) 45 × 55 = (4 × 6)75 = 2475.

4) 65 × 75 = (6 × 8)75 = 4875.

5) 85 × 95 = (8 × 10)75 = 8075.

### III. Multiplication of two digit numbers having the same number at 10’s place and the sum of unit’s place digits is 10.

1) 33 × 37= (3 × 4) 21= 1221.

Explanation:

1) Multiply the last 2 digits at unit’s place  3 and 7 it becomes 21 write this at the right side end.

2) Multiply 3 with next number 4 it becomes 12 then write this at the left side end.

2) 44 × 46 = (4 × 5) 24= 2024.  (Here, 6 × 4 =24, 4 × 5= 20)

3) 36 × 34 = (3 × 4)24 = 1224.

4) 52 × 58 = (5 ×6)16 = 3016.

5) 71 × 79 = (7 × 8)9 = 5609.

6) 87 × 83 = (8 × 9)21 = 7221.

### IV Multiplication of two digit numbers that have 9 at the 10’s place and the sum of digits at unit’s place should be 5 or 10.

1)92 × 93= (92-7) (8 × 7) = 8556

2)93 × 97= (93-3) (7 × 3) = 9021

3) 95 × 95= (95 – 5) (5× 4) = 9020.

4) 96 × 94= (94 – 4) (6 × 4) = 9024.

5) 91 × 94= (91-1) (1 × 4) = 9004.

### V. Multiplication  using Split & Merge Method:

1. 42  × 49 = 42 (50-1)
= 42 × 50 – 42 × 1. (Here use multiplication trick with 5).
= 2100 – 42.

2. 25 × 29 = 25 ( 30 – 1).
= 750 -25.
= 725.

3. 15 × 19 = 15 (20 -1)
= 300 -15.
= 275.

### VI. Horizontal Multiplication  Method:

1. 43 × 23  = 8 _ 9.
(i) we get 8 by multiplying 4 × 2  and place it at first place.
(ii) Multiply unit’s digits and place it right i.e. 3 × 3 =9.
(iii) Middle term = (4 × 3) + (3 × 2) = 12 + 6 = 18.
= 18  9.  = 989.

2. 26 × 21  = 4  _  6.
(i) 2 × 2 = 4 .  (1st term)
(ii) 6 × 1 = 6. ( last )
(iii) (2 × 1) + 6 × 2) = 2 + 12 = 14. (middle). (if there is double digit in middle carry forward to first digit).
Therefore, we get 4  14  6. = 546.

### VI. If the numbers are in a2  – b2  form ( a2  – b2   = (a+b) (a-b)).

1. 37 × 43 = (40 -3) (40+3)
= 1600 -9.
= 1591.

2. 52 × 48 = (50 + 2) (50 -2)
= 2500 -4 = 2496.

### VII. Maths Tricks to Multiply any numbers with 5.

1. 38 × 5
(1) divide 38  by 2 and place 1 zero at the end.
= 38/2  = 190.

2. 46 × 5
Here divide 46 by 2 and place zero at the end.
= 46/2 = 230.

3. 47 × 5
(i) divide 47 by 2 and place 5 for odd numbers (47 is the odd number)  at the end.
47/2 = 235.

4. 568 × 5
(1) divide 568 by 2 and place ‘0’ at the end as 568 is an even number.
568/2 = 2840.

5. 577 × 5.
577 / 2 = 2885.

### VIII. Maths Tricks to Multiply any numbers with 25.

1. 56 ×  25 = 56/4  + 00 = 1400.

2. 66 ×  25  = 66/4  + 00 = 1650.

3. 788 ×  25 = 788 /4 +00 = 19700.

IX. Maths Tricks to Multiply any numbers with 125.

Divide the given number  by 8 and add 000 at the end.

1. 56 × 125 = 56/8 + 000 = 7000.

2. 896 ×125 = 896/8 + 000 = 112000.

(OR) Check Below

### IX. Maths Tricks to Multiply any numbers with 5n.

Example : 974365  × 54
= 9743650000 / 24

1. 75 ×  53
= 75000/23
= 9375.

2. 88 × 52
= 8800/22
= 2200.

### Some Other Useful Maths Formulae  for Bank Exams

1. 2.3 + 3.4 + 4.5 + …….. + n =  [n(n2 +6n + 11)]/3 .

2. 1/1.3 + 1/3.5 + 1/5.7 +  ………. + 1/ (2n+1) (2n-1)   = n/(2n+1).

3. 1 + 3+5+ ……….+(2n +1) = n2.

4. 2 +4 + 6 + ………….. + 2n  = n(n+1).

5. 1 + 2 + 3 + ………..+ n = n(n+1)/2.

6.  12 + 22+32+ …. +n2 = n(n+1)(2n+1)/6.

7.  13 + 23+33+ …. +n3 = [n(n+1)/2]2.

## Addition Tricks For Bank Exams

Addition Tricks for Bank Exams Learn speed maths tricks to improve your calculation ability in …

## Simple Interest and Compound Interest Shortcuts

Simple Interest and Compound Interest Shortcuts With Examples In Every Competitive Exam – IBPS Bank …

## How to Get High Score in Quantitative Aptitude | Speed Maths Tricks

How to Get High Score in Quantitative Aptitude ?| Speed Maths Tricks Quantitative Aptitude (QA) …